NH SB341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eviction procedures on foreclosed properties.
Title
Relative to eviction procedures on foreclosed properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce |