NH SB34 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/11; Chapter 0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/11; Chapter 0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to orders of notice in guardianship cases; relative to approvals of marriages for persons under 18 years of age by the judicial branch family division; and relative to the adjudicatory hearing date in child protection cases.
Title
Relative to orders of notice in guardianship cases; relative to approvals of marriages for persons under 18 years of age by the judicial branch family division; and relative to the adjudicatory hearing date in child protection cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/11; Chapter 0177 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1580 | |
2011-05-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 25 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1391 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0301s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 7, Pg.75 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0301s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.75 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0301s, New Title, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |