NH SB339 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to meetings of boards and commissions in the department of safety.
Title
Relative to meetings of boards and commissions in the department of safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1542h |
2022-04-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; ) |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0671s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0671s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0671s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2021-12-15 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |