NH SB339 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Lay On The Table (Rep Silva): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2333-2334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Lay On The Table (Rep Silva): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2333-2334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Loon Appreciation Day.
Title
Establishing Loon Appreciation Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] | Rep. Robert Greemore [R] |
Rep. Alida Millham [R] | Rep. James Pilliod [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House Lay On The Table (Rep Silva): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2333-2334 | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2333-2334 | |
2012-05-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2042 | |
2012-04-20 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/12/2012 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-06 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-22 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 20, PG.1251 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0639s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.131 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2012-0639s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.131 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-03 | Senate Hearing: 1/19/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.12 |