NH SB337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the immunity of court-appointed special advocates.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the immunity of court-appointed special advocates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 26 |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/11/2016 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 12 |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-04-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 04/13/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-04-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1042s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1042s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | SB 337 was Removed from the Consent Calendar; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1042s, New Title, 03/24/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |