NH SB333 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to net energy metering.
Title
Relative to net energy metering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - Senate - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 0402s (Y: 3 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 33 |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/11/2016 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 14 |
2016-04-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/26/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-04-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-04-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/21/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-04-14 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-1280h: 04/21/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/21/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0120s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-0402s, Regular Calendar 3Y-21N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0120s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/04/2016 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0120s, 02/04/2016; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |