NH SB331 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - No Pending Motion; 03/15/2018 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - No Pending Motion; 03/15/2018 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting Medicaid from paying for sex reassignment drug or hormone therapy or surgery.
Title
Prohibiting Medicaid from paying for sex reassignment drug or hormone therapy or surgery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 03/15/2018 Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Reconsideration on vote of Inexpedient, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Reconsideration on vote of Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Withdraws Motion to Lay on Table; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2017-12-21 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |