NH SB33 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0177; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0177; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical changes to the judicial retirement plan.
Title
Making technical changes to the judicial retirement plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0177; Effective 07/02/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Concur with House Amendment 1255h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1255h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1240 |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment #1255h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1240 |
2013-04-17 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1255h; House Calendar33, PG.1111 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1255h for April 24 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1092-1093 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/10/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0115s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0115s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0115s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/23/13, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin.; Senate Journal 4 |