NH SB323 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of salon.
Title
Relative to the definition of salon.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/18/2024, Vote 3-0; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |