NH SB317 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/25/2014; Chapter 0257; Effective 10/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/25/2014; Chapter 0257; Effective 10/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to trafficking in persons.
Title
Relative to trafficking in persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - OTPA (Y: 327 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/25/2014; Chapter 0257; Effective 10/23/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1467h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep. Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1467h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 327-0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment #2014-1467h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1467h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/15/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0238s, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; OT3rd |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0238s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0238s, 2/6/14; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/14, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |