NH SB315 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1658
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1658
Summary
Relative to the selection of members of the conservation commission.
Title
Relative to the selection of members of the conservation commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1658 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for April 21 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1527 | |
2010-03-31 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/31/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 26, PG.1391 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.150 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0932s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.144 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 0932s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.144 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment 0905s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.143 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0905s, 3/10/10; Senate Calendar 10, Pg.9 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Hearing; January 20, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.4 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2759&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |