NH SB313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0314; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0314; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the office of professional licensure and certification to establish fees.
Title
Relative to the authority of the office of professional licensure and certification to establish fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0314; Effective 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2066c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2066c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2066c Filed 05/18/2022; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/18/2022, 10:00 am, Room 103, State House |
2022-05-13 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. T. Lekas Replaces Rep. Pearson 05/13/2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Schuett, S. Pearson 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, Carson, Rosenwald; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1791h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1791h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1791h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/26/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1385h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 1385h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1385h(NT) (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2022-04-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/08/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1118s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1118s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1118s, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |