NH SB313 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - VI. Remainder Effective 12/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reforming New Hampshire's Medicaid and Premium Assistance Program, establishing the granite workforce pilot program, and relative to certain liquor funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reforming New Hampshire's Medicaid and Premium Assistance Program, establishing the granite workforce pilot program, and relative to certain liquor funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Concur (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 92 N: 236 NV: 33 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 303 N: 29 NV: 29 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 222 N: 125 NV: 14 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 43 N: 302 NV: 16 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 208 N: 133 NV: 20 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 0998s (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateVI. Remainder Effective 12/31/2018
2018-07-10SenateV. Section 3-9 shall take effect 01/01/2019
2018-07-10SenateIV. RSA 126-AA:2, II(b) as inserted by Section 1, shall take effect as provided in Section 21
2018-07-10SenateIII. Section 1 shall take effect 06/28/2018
2018-07-10SenateII. Paragraph III and VII of Section 24 shall take effect 12/31/2023
2018-07-10SenateI. Paragraph II of Section 24 shall take effect 12/01/2022
2018-07-10SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/28/2018; Chapter 0342
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-25SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2086e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-24HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2086e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 16Y-6N, Motion Adopted; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1769h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseFLAM # 2018-1854h (NT) (Rep. Hoell): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 92-236 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseAmendment # 2018-1769h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 303-29 05/03/2018
2018-04-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1769h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 24-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 20
2018-04-19HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/20/2018 02:05 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-18HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-18House==TIME CHANGE== Division III Work Session: 04/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-18HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/19/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-18HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/20/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-12HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-06HouseReferred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 15
2018-04-05House==TIME CHANGE== Division III Work Session: 04/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-05HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/10/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-05HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/09/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-05HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/06/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1282h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 222-125 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 13
2018-04-05HouseFLAM # 2018-1306h (Rep. McConnell): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 43-302 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 11
2018-04-05HouseAmendment # 2018-1282h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 208-133 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 8
2018-03-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1282h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7
2018-03-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/28/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am State House Reps Hall
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0984s, and 2018-1022s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1022s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-0998s, Regular Calendar 7Y-17N, Amendment Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment # 2018-1030s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1036s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0984s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Amendment Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to After SB 422, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to 5:00 PM, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0984s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-02-16SenatePlease Note: This hearing will be streamed live via the Internet at the following web address: http://sg001-harmony.sliq.net/00288/Harmony/en/PowerBrowser/PowerBrowserV2/20180220/1024/15265
2018-02-16SenateHearing: 02/20/2018, Room Reps Hall, State House, 01:30 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-0700s; Senate Calendar 8A
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2956&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1972&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1972
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1972
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=1972
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=81&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=174&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=175&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=176&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=214&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=215&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=251&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2956

Bill Comments

feedback