NH SB310 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to bear registration, federal duck stamps, and the transport of out of state lobsters and crabs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to bear registration, federal duck stamps, and the transport of out of state lobsters and crabs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024
2024-07-11SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18
2024-05-30SenateSen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16
2024-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-1659h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 36
2024-05-23HouseAmendment # 2024-1659h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 36
2024-05-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1659h (NT) 05/07/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 11
2024-04-26HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1659h: 05/07/2024 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 307
2024-04-24House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1611h: 05/07/2024 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 307
2024-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 307
2024-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2024-02-29HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 6 P. 138
2024-02-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0675s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5
2024-02-20SenateCommittee Amendment # 2024-0675s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5
2024-02-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0675s, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2024-02-07SenateHearing: 02/13/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 7
2023-12-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback