NH SB310 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0296; Effective 06/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0296; Effective 06/21/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the defense and indemnification provided under RSA 99-D to certain claims filed with and investigations by professional licensing boards, committees, and regulatory agencies, and repealing the commission to study expansion of defense and indemnification rights to certain state employees.
Title
Expanding the defense and indemnification provided under RSA 99-D to certain claims filed with and investigations by professional licensing boards, committees, and regulatory agencies, and repealing the commission to study expansion of defense and indemnification rights to certain state employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0296; Effective 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2007c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2007c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 11 |
2016-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-2007c Filed 05/26/2016; As Amended by the House |
2016-05-20 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. P. Schmidt Replaces Rep S. Schmidt 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 30 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/23/2016, 11:00 am, Room 103, State House |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. A. Christie, Sytek, Hansen, S. Schmidt 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. A. Christie): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 16 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Cataldo, Soucy; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 1236h, New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 05/19/2016 Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1236h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 14 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1236h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 14 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1236h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 8 |
2016-04-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/26/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2016 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/18/2016; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2016; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing: 02/10/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |