NH SB310 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-38; House Journal 43, PG.2331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-38; House Journal 43, PG.2331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the commemoration of Purple Day in recognition of epilepsy awareness and relative to the observance of Cancer Prevention Day.
Title
Relative to the commemoration of Purple Day in recognition of epilepsy awareness and relative to the observance of Cancer Prevention Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Marc Tremblay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 261-38; House Journal 43, PG.2331 | |
2012-05-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 15 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2041 | |
2012-04-20 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-06 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/19/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/17/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-03-21 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 28, PG.1719 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1130s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.257 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1130s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.191 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1130s, New Title, 3/21/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 3/6/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.10 |