NH SB31 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - II. Remainder Effective 07/20/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - II. Remainder Effective 07/20/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Title
Relative to the controlled drug prescription health and safety program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/20/15 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | I. Section 10 Effective 05/21/15 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/21/15; Chapter 0048 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1751 |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 6 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1508 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1298 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0990s and 1133s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2015-1133s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0990s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0990s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |