NH SB303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to state aid to school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state aid to school districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0469s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0469s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0469s, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback