NH SB301 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Temporarily reducing the real estate transfer tax for first-time home buyers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporarily reducing the real estate transfer tax for first-time home buyers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-24HouseExecutive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-08-16HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-04-12HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 9
2018-04-04HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/12/2018 (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6
2018-03-27HouseExecutive Session: 04/03/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-21HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 53
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-02-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0820s, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-22SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-0820s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-22SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-22SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8
2018-01-18SenateHearing: 01/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 4
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback