NH SB3 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0205; Effective 09/08/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to domicile for voting purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to domicile for voting purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - OTPA (Y: 191 N: 162 NV: 18 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 155 N: 198 NV: 18 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Table (Y: 166 N: 191 NV: 14 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Commitee Amendment 1016s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0205; Effective 09/08/2017
2017-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017
2017-06-08SenateSen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseReconsider SB 3 (Rep. J. Graham): Motion Failed DV 152-197 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 116
2017-06-01HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1775h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-162 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 114
2017-06-01HouseFLAM #2017-2116h (Rep. Porter): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 155-198 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 110
2017-06-01HouseAmendment #2017-1775h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 110
2017-06-01HouseLay on Table (Rep. Dyer): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 166-191 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 108
2017-05-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1775h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 13
2017-05-10HouseExecutive Session: 05/16/2017 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-05-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-04-11HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2017 10:00 am Representatives Hall
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1016s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1016s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1016s, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-02SenateHearing: 03/07/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am, on proposed amendment #2017-0478s; Senate Calendar 13
2017-02-21SenateHearing: 03/07/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=883&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=885&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=80&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=81&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=138&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=139&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=140&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=190&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=883

Bill Comments

feedback