NH SB3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for reasonable value of services.
Title
Relative to payment for reasonable value of services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Prescott moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1065s, New Title, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing:===TIME CHANGE=== 2/10/15, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |