NH SB3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - House Conferee Change: Rep Kappler Replaces Rep Sedensky; House Journal 48, PG.1670
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - House Conferee Change: Rep Kappler Replaces Rep Sedensky; House Journal 48, PG.1670
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making comprehensive changes to the state retirement system.
Title
Making comprehensive changes to the state retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-14 - House - LAY ON THE TABLE (REP BETTENCOURT) (Y: 259 N: 104 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - C OF C REPORT: HOUSE AM 1576H(NT), 1710H + NEW AM 2289C (Y: 250 N: 112 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - OTP/AM 1576H(NT) AND 1710H (Y: 238 N: 121 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLAM 1674H (REP SHURTLEFF) (Y: 123 N: 232 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment 0916s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0896s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Merrill Floor Amendment 0910s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 0895s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - C OF C REPORT: HOUSE AM 1576H(NT), 1710H + NEW AM 2289C (Y: 250 N: 112 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - OTP/AM 1576H(NT) AND 1710H (Y: 238 N: 121 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLAM 1674H (REP SHURTLEFF) (Y: 123 N: 232 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment 0916s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 0896s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Merrill Floor Amendment 0910s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 0895s (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 5 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | House Conferee Change: Rep Kappler Replaces Rep Sedensky; House Journal 48, PG.1670 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/6/2011 9:00 a.m., Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-31 | Senate === CANCELLED === Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/2/2011 9:00 a.m., Room 302-304, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-27 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/31/2011 10:00 a.m., Room 302-304, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Groen Replaces Senator Larsen; Senate Journal 19, Pg.396 | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2011 10:00 a.m., Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2011 10:00 a.m., Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-16 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/20/2011 11:30 a.m., Room 305-307, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/13/2011 11:00 a.m., Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/12/2011 10:30 a.m., Room 201-203, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/9/2011 1:00 p.m., Room 306-308, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-05-04 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hawkins, Kurk, W.Smith, and Sedensky; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-05-04 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1489-1490 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Carson, and Larsen; Senate Journal 15, Pg.311 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1576h (NT) and #1710h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.311 | |
2011-05-04 | House Reconsideration (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 108-254; House Journal 42, PG.1440 | |
2011-05-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1576h(NT) and #1710h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-121; House Journal 42, PG.1420-1440 | |
2011-05-04 | House Floor Amendment #2011-1674h (Rep Shurtleff) Failed, Regular Calendar 123-232; House Journal 42, PG.1431-1438 | |
2011-05-04 | House Floor Amendment #2011-1710h (Rep Hawkins) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1431 | |
2011-05-04 | House Amendment #1576h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1420-1430 | |
2011-05-04 | House Special Order to Beginning of Reg Cal and if Passed, House Rules be Suspended to Allow Immediate Third Reading (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 42, PG.1420 | |
2011-04-28 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 36, PG.1250 | |
2011-04-28 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1576h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.1259-1269 | |
2011-04-28 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1576h(NT) for May 4 (Vote 10-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1250 | |
2011-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-04-06 | House Public Hearing: 4/13/2011 2:00 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform; House Journal 35, PG.1240 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.239 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1221s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.222 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Amendment 1221s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.221 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1221s, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0701s, 0797s, 0905s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 9, Pg.161 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment #2011-0916s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 9, Pg.161 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment #2011-0896s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 9, Pg.157 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Merrill Floor Amendment #2011-0910s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 9, Pg.156 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-0905s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.155 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-0895s, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 9, Pg.155 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Larsen Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 5Y-19N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 9, Pg.154 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2011-0797s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.154 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0701s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.154 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0701s, 3/16/11 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Without Objection, President Bragdon moved to Special Order SB 3 to following lunch | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0701s, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/25/11, Representatives' Hall, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7, Pg.65 |