NH SB294 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dedicated funds administered by the department of labor, department of environmental services, banking department, and secretary of state.
Title
Relative to dedicated funds administered by the department of labor, department of environmental services, banking department, and secretary of state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.282 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Hearing: 1/26/12, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1, Pg.9 |