NH SB290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/06/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/06/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the practice of auriculotherapy.
Title
Relative to the practice of auriculotherapy.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/06/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |