NH SB290 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Conference Committee Report # 2019-2626c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the New Hampshire granite advantage health care program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the New Hampshire granite advantage health care program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 143 NV: 15 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - OTP (Y: 210 N: 150 NV: 17 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2626c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment
2019-06-20Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/20/2019, 11:00 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-19Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 04:00 pm, Room 103, State House
2019-06-18Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:00 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-17Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/18/2019, 08:15 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-17Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/17/2019, 09:00 am, Room 103, State House
2019-06-14SenateConferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Gray; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-14SenateConferee Change; Senator Feltes Replaces Senator Sherman; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Martin, Nordgren, Campion, Weber 06/06/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Martin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Rosenwald, Sherman, Gray; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Sherman Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2331h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-143 06/05/2019
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2331h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2331h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 15
2019-05-22HouseExecutive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-14HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-02HouseLay on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Failed DV 148-208 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-150 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Finance 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 16
2019-04-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 10
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 74
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order to after Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0834s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0834s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0834s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=893&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=895&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=895
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=HP&id=895
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=67&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0290&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290&ddlsponsors=&lsr=893
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=68&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0290&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290&ddlsponsors=&lsr=893
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=111&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0290&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290&ddlsponsors=&lsr=893
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=171&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0290&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290&ddlsponsors=&lsr=893
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=215&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0290&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB290&ddlsponsors=&lsr=893

Bill Comments

feedback