NH SB289 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Senate Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Senate Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to presenting photo identification to vote in person.
Title
Relative to presenting photo identification to vote in person.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Sen. Russell Prescott [R] |
Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - SHALL SB 289 BECOME LAW (Y: 231 N: 112 NV: 35 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2466 (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - C OF C #2466C (REP BATES) (Y: 255 N: 103 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - OTP/AM 2169H (Y: 226 N: 115 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - MAJ AM 2169H (Y: 223 N: 118 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - SHALL SB 289 BECOME LAW (Y: 231 N: 112 NV: 35 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2466 (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - C OF C #2466C (REP BATES) (Y: 255 N: 103 NV: 17 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - OTP/AM 2169H (Y: 226 N: 115 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - MAJ AM 2169H (Y: 223 N: 118 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2500e Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2500e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.2611 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2466c; Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2466c Adopted, Regular Calendar 255-103; House Journal 51, PG.2543-2551 | |
2012-05-31 | House Conference Committee Report #2012-2466c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 42, PG.2264 | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Boutin Replaces Senator Merrill | |
2012-05-30 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/31/2012, 8:00 a.m., Room 103, State House | |
2012-05-30 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/30/2012, 1:00 p.m., Room 103, State House | |
2012-05-29 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/30/2012, 8:00 a.m., Room 103, State House | |
2012-05-24 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 10:00 a.m., Room 103, State House | |
2012-05-24 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Bates, Tucker, W.Smith, and DeLemus [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488 | |
2012-05-24 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Tucker) [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2488 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Barnes, and Merrill | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Barnes Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2169h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2169h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-115; House Journal 43, PG.2304-2316 | |
2012-05-15 | House Amendment #2169h Adopted, Regular Calendar 223-118; House Journal 43, PG.2304-2316 | |
2012-05-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 37, PG.2040 | |
2012-05-10 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2012-2169h; House Calendar 37, PG.2085-2089 | |
2012-05-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2169h for May 15 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2040 | |
2012-05-03 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-05-03 | House Public Hearing on Proposed Non-Germane Amendment #2012-2044h: 5/8/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-05-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-25 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 5/3/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-25 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/2/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-25 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/25/2012 Legislative Office Building 308 1:00 PM or 30 Minutes Following House Sesson | |
2012-04-11 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/17/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-04-04 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 23, PG.1448 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0972s, 1146s, Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.173; Senate Journal 6, Pg.173 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration of vote on SB 289, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.173 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0972s, 1146s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Sen. Merrill Floor Amendment #2012-1142s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.172 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1146s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.171 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 0972s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.169 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0972s, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === 2/21/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 1/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m. | |
2012-01-04 | Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |