NH SB286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to abatements for prior years' property taxes.
Title
Relative to abatements for prior years' property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation(Vote 13-0) |
2014-09-15 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-09-15 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-05-07 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/15/14 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal & County Government |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0863s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0863s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0863s, 3/13/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |