NH SB280 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to meetings of the state health assessment and health improvement plan advisory council and the therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Title
Relative to meetings of the state health assessment and health improvement plan advisory council and the therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending Motion Interim Study; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |