NH SB277 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to grants to chartered public schools.
Title
Relative to grants to chartered public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-0816s; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0816s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |