NH SB275 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 275 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that all of the state's motor vehicles will be zero emissions vehicles by the year 2039.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring that all of the state's motor vehicles will be zero emissions vehicles by the year 2039.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTP (Y: 205 N: 145 NV: 20 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 275 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-06-27SenateVetoed by Governor 06/25/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-145 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 49
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 12
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-28HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-0830s, and 2019-0992s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2019-0992s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0830s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0830s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-11SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:05 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=854&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB275
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=856&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=856
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=HP&id=856
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=75&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0275&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB275&ddlsponsors=&lsr=854
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=185&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0275&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB275&ddlsponsors=&lsr=854
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=252&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0275&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB275&ddlsponsors=&lsr=854

Bill Comments

feedback