NH SB270 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appropriations to the department of transportation.
Title
Relative to appropriations to the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2023; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2023; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced 02/14/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 8 |