NH SB270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - II. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - II. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a tax credit against the business profits tax for donations to career and technical education centers.
Title
Establishing a tax credit against the business profits tax for donations to career and technical education centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 06/30/2022 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 247 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2280h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 36 |
2019-06-06 | House | Amendment # 2019-2280h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 36 |
2019-05-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2280h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 23 |
2019-05-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |