NH SB267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Law Without Signature 08/13/2019; Chapter 323; Effective 10/12/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the release of student assessment information and data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the release of student assessment information and data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 206 N: 146 NV: 13 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 133 NV: 29 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 132 N: 203 NV: 35 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenateLaw Without Signature 08/13/2019; Chapter 323; Effective 10/12/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56
2019-07-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2663e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2663e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2595c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2595c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 206-146 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 18
2019-06-19HouseConference Committee Report # 2019-2595c Filed 06/13/2019; House Amendment + New Amendment
2019-06-19SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/19/2019, 09:00 am, Room 100, State House
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Myler, Luneau, Tanner, Mullen 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-12HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 45
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Kahn, Morgan, Starr; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Kahn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1718h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-133 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 73
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1847h (Rep. Ladd): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 132-203 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 73
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1718h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 73
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1718h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 15
2019-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 74
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1135s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1135s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1135s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=832&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB267
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=834&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=834
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=834
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=97&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0267&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB267&ddlsponsors=&lsr=832
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=191&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0267&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB267&ddlsponsors=&lsr=832
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=192&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0267&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB267&ddlsponsors=&lsr=832
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=238&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0267&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB267&ddlsponsors=&lsr=832

Bill Comments

feedback