NH SB266 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019-1168s; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to funding for kindergarten pupils, keno revenues, and school building aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to funding for kindergarten pupils, keno revenues, and school building aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019-1168s; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1168s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1168s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0819s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0819s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0819s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:55 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback