NH SB264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain references to the department of energy and transferring authority over the low-income electricity assistance program to the department of energy.
Title
Relative to certain references to the department of energy and transferring authority over the low-income electricity assistance program to the department of energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-15 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2022 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1058s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1058s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1058s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |