NH SB263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-150 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-150 05/05/2022 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire youth environmental education and conservation council.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire youth environmental education and conservation council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - ITL (Y: 174 N: 150 NV: 29 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-150 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1063s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1063s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1063s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/10/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |