NH SB263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 282; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to anti-discrimination protection for students in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to anti-discrimination protection for students in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - OTP (Y: 211 N: 141 NV: 13 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 214 N: 143 NV: 13 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 146 N: 207 NV: 17 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1290s the Balance of the Amendment (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1290s Lines 1-11 to the period after RSA 354-A. (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 282; Effective 09/17/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-141 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 71
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2310h: Amendment Failed DV 134-215 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 71
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2310h
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 17
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Judiciary 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 18
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1690h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-143 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 18
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1717h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 146-207 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 18
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1690h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 18
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1717h (NT)
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1690h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 9
2019-04-18House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2019-04-18House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 74
2019-03-28SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1290s, the balance of the amendment; Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment: 2019-1290s: Lines 1-11 to the period after RSA 354-A.; Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1290s: Lines 1-11 to the period after RSA 354-A.; Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Watters Moved to divide the Question on Floor Amendment # 2019-1290s: Lines 1-11 to the period after RSA 354-A. and then the balance of the amendment; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2019-1290s; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1141s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1141s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/04/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=995&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1023&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1023
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1023
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=121&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=122&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=123&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=178&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=179&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=217&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=218&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0263&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB263&ddlsponsors=&lsr=995

Bill Comments

feedback