NH SB261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for warrant articles.
Title
Relative to requirements for warrant articles.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Rep. Chris Nevins [R] |
Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. James Waddell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2234 | |
2012-05-03 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 9 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2009 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-04-18 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/3/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-27 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/3/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/4/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 23, PG.1447 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0813s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.168 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 0813s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.167 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0813s, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/7/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.6 |