NH SB260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire pharmaceutical assistance pilot program for seniors and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire pharmaceutical assistance pilot program for seniors and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1144s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1144s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1144s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-0836s, and 2019-0972s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0972s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0836s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |