NH SB255 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB255
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the expectation of privacy.
Title
Relative to the expectation of privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 37 |
2023-05-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-05-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0935s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0835s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Reconsideration on Committee Amendment 2023-0835, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-0935s; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0835s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 255 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0835s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB255 (Carry Over) 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39