NH SB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB255
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2771h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2771h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dementia training for direct care staff in residential facilities and community-based settings.
Title
Relative to dementia training for direct care staff in residential facilities and community-based settings.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Rep. Megan Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2771h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-22 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-10-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-09-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-05-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-17 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced 03/14/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0872s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0872s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0872s, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB255 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2771h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)