NH SB255 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study low-wage workers and their effect on the New Hampshire economy.
Title
Establishing a committee to study low-wage workers and their effect on the New Hampshire economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off |
2015-06-15 | House | Conferee Change: Rep A. White Replaces Rep Ley; House Journal 46, PG. 1991 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === RESCHEDULED === 6/16/2015, 1:30 p.m., Room 103, State House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: === CANCELLED === 6/11/2015, 11:25 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2015-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Infantine, Simmons, L. Turcotte, Ley (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Cataldo, and Soucy |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Prescott moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1958h, New Title; Requests C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1958h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1946-1947 |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment #1958h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1946-1947 |
2015-05-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-05-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1958h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1638-1639 |
2015-05-20 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-05-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/28/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |