NH SB255 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an innovation business tax incentive program and credit against interest and dividend taxes.
Title
Establishing an innovation business tax incentive program and credit against interest and dividend taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED === |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/30/14; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/14, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |