NH SB255 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0104; Effective 07/28/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0104; Effective 07/28/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liens for land use change tax assessments.
Title
Relative to liens for land use change tax assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/29/2012; Chapter 0104; Effective 07/28/2012 | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2480 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2237 | |
2012-05-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 9 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2011-2012 | |
2012-05-01 | House Continued Executive Session: 5/3/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-04-04 | House Executive Session: 5/1/2012 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-04-04 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 1:20 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-02-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/24/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-02-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 4/24/2012 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-02-22 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 15, PG.906 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 3, Pg.75 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/25/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Hearing: 1/17/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 a.m. | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.6 |