NH SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 204; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 204; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the detection and prevention of financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.
Title
Relative to the detection and prevention of financial exploitation of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 204; Effective 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 289-54 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 70 |
2019-05-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2158h |
2019-05-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 16 |
2019-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-05-08 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing: 05/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0317s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0317s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0317s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |