NH SB252 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study a number plate commemorating Laconia Motorcycle Week.
Title
Establishing a committee to study a number plate commemorating Laconia Motorcycle Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/05/2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 237-125; House Journal 36, PG. 1585 |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1487 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing: 3/10/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 6 |