NH SB247 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - ==CONTINUED== Retained Bill Division III Work Session: 10/19/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
Hearing: Oct 19 @ 1:30 am in PM Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Preventing childhood lead poisoning from paint and water and making an appropriation to a special fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing childhood lead poisoning from paint and water and making an appropriation to a special fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 233 N: 109 NV: 29 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 112 N: 238 NV: 21 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Table (Y: 128 N: 225 NV: 19 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Rerefer (Y: 7 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11House==CONTINUED== Retained Bill Division III Work Session: 10/19/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2017-10-09House==RECESSED== Retained Bill Division III Work Session: 10/11/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-09-28House==RECESSED== Retained Bill Division III Work Session: 10/05/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203
2017-09-11House==RECESSED== Division III Retained Bill Work Session: 09/28/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2017-05-24HouseRetained in Committee
2017-05-10HouseExecutive Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-16HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-10House==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 05/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-10HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/16/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-04HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-04HousePublic Hearing: 05/09/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Finance 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 46
2017-05-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1628h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 233-109 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 44
2017-05-04HouseFLAM #2017-1611h (Rep. Prout): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 112-238 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 42
2017-05-04HouseFLAM #2017-1628h (Rep. J. Graham): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 41
2017-05-04HouseLay SB 247 on Table (Rep. Verville): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 128-225 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 39
2017-05-04HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Prout) 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 2
2017-04-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/04/2017 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6
2017-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/12/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 28
2017-03-31SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Feltes Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 7Y-15N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-29SenateSpecial Order SB 247-FN- to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23SenateSpecial Order SB 247-FN-A to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2017-0795s, and #2017-0877s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-0877s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0795s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0795s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-16SenateHearing: 02/21/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=979&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=978&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=57&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=96&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=97&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=124&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=125&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=126&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0247&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB247&ddlsponsors=&lsr=979

Bill Comments

feedback