NH SB247 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to duties of the legislative oversight committee established under the statewide education improvement and assessment program.
Title
Relative to duties of the legislative oversight committee established under the statewide education improvement and assessment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |