NH SB244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - III. Remainder Effective 06/11/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - III. Remainder Effective 06/11/15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to abuse and neglect investigations and establishing a commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Title
Relative to abuse and neglect investigations and establishing a commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 06/11/15 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | II. Section 5 Effective 06/30/16 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | I. Sections 1, 2, & 3 Effective 01/01/16 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/11/16; Chapter 0127 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1877e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1877EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Concurs with House Amendment #1388h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1388h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1748-1749 |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment #1388h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1748-1749 |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1388 for May 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1507 |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0974s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0974s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0974s, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/10/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |