NH SB243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the low and moderate income homeowners property tax relief program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 100, State House, 12:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback